MD SB761 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB550
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to report certain information regarding the gender identities of inmates and the housing status of transgender, nonbinary, or intersex inmates; prohibiting an employee of a correctional facility from discriminating against inmates on the basis of certain protected classes; requiring the managing official of a correctional facility to develop a written nondiscrimination policy regarding inmates; etc.
Title
Correctional Facilities - Transgender, Nonbinary, and Intersex Inmates (Transgender Respect, Agency, and Dignity Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB426 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-01 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
SB550 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
SB550 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Corrections
Discrimination
Gender
Health
Housing
Human Rights
Prisoners
Reports
Safety
Search and Seizure
Correctional Officers
Corrections
Discrimination
Gender
Health
Housing
Human Rights
Prisoners
Reports
Safety
Search and Seizure
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 3 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 9 | 614 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 9 | 618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 9 | 619 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 9 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0761?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0761f.pdf |