MD SB761 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Task Force on the Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2015-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {524266/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2015-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {339634/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Disabled
Education
Estates and Trusts
Exemptions
Fees
Forms
Health
Hearings
Higher Education
Housing
Income Tax
Investments
Job Training
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Nonresidents
Power of Attorney
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Tuition
Vocational Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Disabled
Education
Estates and Trusts
Exemptions
Fees
Forms
Health
Hearings
Higher Education
Housing
Income Tax
Investments
Job Training
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Nonresidents
Power of Attorney
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Tuition
Vocational Rehabilitation