MD SB761 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-01 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-01 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to make a report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2012, regarding the manner in which the Department will work toward ensuring that youth charged as adults can be detained in juvenile detention facilities; etc.
Title
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities - Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-01 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 838578/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Correctional Institutions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Reports
Transportation
Correctional Institutions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Reports
Transportation