MD SB759 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement, for purposes of a specified tax credit, that specified projects must be located in a sustainable community; requiring the Director of the Maryland Historical Trust to adopt regulations that establish specified procedures to announce to the public the selection of a commercial rehabilitation project for an award of an initial credit certificate not later than 60 days after the selection is made; extending the termination of the sustainable communities tax credit from July 1, 2017, to July 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alteration and Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-12) (Y: 126 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-12) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {819136/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Commercial Rehabilitation
Community Development
Counties
Federal Government
Fees
Grants
Historical Matters
Loans
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Time
Community Development
Counties
Federal Government
Fees
Grants
Historical Matters
Loans
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Time