MD SB758 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a credit against the State income tax for the total installed costs paid or incurred by a taxpayer that installs an energy storage system and who obtains a tax credit certificate from the Maryland Energy Administration; requiring the Administration to issue tax credits not to exceed specified amounts; prohibiting the Administration from issuing an aggregate amount of tax credit certificates exceeding $750,000 in a taxable year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-11) (Y: 101 N: 11 NV: 28 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389
2017-04-10SenatePassed Enrolled
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-04-10SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2017-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (101-11)
2017-04-10HouseFloor Amendment {883825/1 (Delegate Reznik) Adopted
2017-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {945260/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2017-03-23HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-10HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2017-03-10SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-08SenateFloor Amendment {873227/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2017-03-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-08SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2017-03-08SenateFavorable
2017-03-07SenateSpecial Order until 3/8 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2017-03-07SenateFavorable
2017-03-06SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2017-03-01SenateHearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.
2017-02-24SenateHearing canceled
2017-03-01SenateHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0758&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0758f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0758t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0758e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_389_sb0758e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0758_87322701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0758_94526001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0758_88382501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0758.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0758_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0758_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0758,s-0506&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0758,s-1519&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0758,h-1476&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback