MD SB757 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Comptroller to implement electronic filing of alcoholic beverage tax returns on or before January 1, 2018.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Taxes - Electronic Filing of Returns
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Kaiser) Adopted (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Kaiser) Adopted (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (138-0) |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m. |
2016-04-08 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2016-04-07 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {459630/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |