MD SB757 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to disclose prescription monitoring data to specified entities.
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required Disclosures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381 |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {227574/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Clinics
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Disclosure
Diseases
Drugs
Education
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Liability
Licenses
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Public Health
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Disclosure
Diseases
Drugs
Education
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Liability
Licenses
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Public Health
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment