MD SB754 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, under specified circumstances, a reporting agency from entering into a public-private partnership or executing an agreement, under a specified provision of law, with a private entity; requiring a private entity to certify to the reporting agency whether the entity had direct involvement in the deportation of specified victims; requiring an entity, under specified circumstances, to certify to the reporting agency specified information; etc.
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Contracts
Disclosure
General Services, Department of
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Mass Transit
Privatization
Public Works
Railroads
Reparations
Restitution
State Government - Procurement
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Victims
Contracts
Disclosure
General Services, Department of
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Mass Transit
Privatization
Public Works
Railroads
Reparations
Restitution
State Government - Procurement
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Victims