MD SB754 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from shooting or discharging any firearm or other deadly weapon within 500 yards of a public or nonpublic school while hunting for any wild bird or mammal.
Title
Hunting - Schools - Expanded Safety Zone
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |