MD SB754 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including specified service by specified former employees of counties and municipal corporations in the definition of "total State service" for purposes of determining the accrual of annual leave for specified State employees.
Title
State Personnel - Accrual of Annual Leave - Local Government Service
Sponsors
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. David Harrington [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Sen. Michael Lenett [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn | |
2010-03-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0754.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0754f.pdf |