MD SB751 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the termination date to September 30, 2022, for certain provisions of law authorizing certain hybrid vehicles to use a certain high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lane regardless of the number of passengers under certain circumstances; extending the termination date to September 30, 2022 for certain provisions of law making certain requirements regarding the use of HOV lanes by plug-in electric drive vehicles applicable to qualified hybrid vehicles; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-6) (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-6) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |