MD SB751 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the applicability of specified requirements for an offset from specified retirement allowances from the State Police Retirement System for specified individuals who accept employment with specified participating employers; extending a termination provision that applies to specified provisions that relate to the reemployment of retirees of the State Police Retirement System; etc.
Title
State Police Retirement System - Reemployment of Retirees
Sponsors
Sen. James Robey [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2013-04-06 | House | House Recede |
2013-04-06 | House | Motion Recede (Delegate Griffith) Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2013-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {434064/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-28 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 9:00 a.m. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 8:30 a.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Contractors
Law Enforcement
Reports
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Law Enforcement
Reports
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment