MD SB751 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a penalty for knowingly selling or distributing for use or sale within the State specified household dishwashing detergents.
Title
Environment - Dishwashing Detergent Containing Phosphorus - Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (125-9) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2011-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (42-4) | |
2011-03-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Environmental Matters
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Penalties and Sentences
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Environmental Matters
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Penalties and Sentences