MD SB75 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to a certain limitation, to provide coverage for hair prostheses to Program recipients whose hair loss results from alopecia areata and prescription drugs and medical devices approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration for the treatment of alopecia areata; and requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for a hair prosthesis for hair loss resulting from alopecia areata.
Title
Insurance and Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Treatment of Alopecia Areata – Coverage Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2022-11-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Equipment
Federal Government
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Federal Government
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 836 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0075?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0075f.pdf |