MD SB749 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding the Maryland Health Care Commission to the list of entities to which the Health Services Cost Review Commission may disclose specified physician information; requiring the State Board of Physicians to disclose information contained in a record to the Maryland Health Care Commission for a specified purpose; adding the Maryland Health Care Commission to the list of entities that must adopt regulations for the transfer of information in a record; etc.
Title
Physicians - Sharing of Information with Maryland Health Care Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (124-1) | |
2012-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Finance & Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Physicians
Records
Rules and Regulations
Disclosure
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Physicians
Records
Rules and Regulations