MD SB748 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified provisions of law related to the sale of livestock apply to specified deer; providing that the Maryland Wholesome Meat Act applies to specified deer; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture and the Department of Natural Resources on or before October 1, 2016, to adopt regulations to establish requirements for the processing, inspection, labeling and sale of wild venison in the State; authorizing a person who holds a crop damage permit to hunt deer under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Deer Hunting - Crop Damage Permit - Wild Venison
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Inspections
Labeling
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Inspections
Labeling
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations