MD SB747 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which interest may be imposed by Frederick County on certain property taxes not paid on or before October 1 of the taxable year; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 20, 2022.
Title
Frederick County - Property Tax - Semiannual Payment Schedule and Imposition of Interest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 10 | 204.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Frederick County | 2 | 7-3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0747?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0747f.pdf |