MD SB747 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Anne Arundel County Board of Education from paying monetary compensation to the county superintendent of schools for sick leave benefits earned while employed by any other board of education or public school system.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {634234/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Leave
Public Officials
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Leave
Public Officials
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment