MD SB744 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a method of electing judges to the circuit court on a nonpartisan basis, without regard to political party affiliation; establishing a primary election for candidates for nomination for a circuit court judgeship to be administered in a specified manner under specified circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2017-03-03SenateHearing canceled
2017-03-07SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback