MD SB74 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the Marine Contractors Licensing Board is subject to the Maryland Program Evaluation Act; establishing that the Board is a unit in the Department of the Environment; authorizing the Board, by regulation, to establish certain license categories; requiring the Board to include a license category on each license issued by the Board; providing for the termination of the Board and certain provisions of law relating to the Board after July 1, 2031; etc.
Title
Environment - Marine Contractors Licensing Board - Authority, Program Evaluation, and Termination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Licenses
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Licenses
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 1 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 17 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 17 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 17 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 17 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 17 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 8 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |