MD SB739 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to pay certain financial incentives under certain circumstances and to adjust compensation for certain employees in the Investment Division of the State Retirement Agency under certain circumstances.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division - Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-37) |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 8:30 a.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1091 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Investments
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Committees and Commissions
Investments
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |