MD SB736 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering certain definitions applicable to certain prohibitions against possessing, distributing, and creating child pornography; prohibiting a person from knowingly possessing and intentionally retaining a certain representation showing a computer-generated image that is indistinguishable from an actual and identifiable child under the age of 16 years portrayed in a certain manner; defining "indistinguishable from an actual and identifiable child"; applying certain penalties; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Child Pornography

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-0) (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (127-0)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseDelegates Atterbeary, R. Watson, and Pippy
2019-04-06HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-06HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenators Cassilly, West, and Waldstreicher
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {682711/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {808279/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-12SenateHearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-02-12SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0736&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0736f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0736t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0736e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0736_80827901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0736_68271101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0736_85352301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0736_74302101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0736.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0736_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0675.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0736_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1197.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0736_74302101.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1612.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1430.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback