MD SB736 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant who is charged with assault in the first degree or assault in the second degree against a victim who is a law enforcement officer; providing that a judge may authorize the pretrial release of a certain defendant on suitable bail or certain other conditions or both; requiring a judge to order the continued detention of a defendant who is considered a flight risk or one who poses a danger to another person or community; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Assault
Bail
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Judges
Law Enforcement
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety
Bail
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Judges
Law Enforcement
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety