MD SB736 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to borrow not more than $26,300,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in St. Mary's County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-24 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {779334/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
St. Mary's County
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
St. Mary's County