MD SB734 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Information Technology to issue certain standards and guidelines for units of State government for the appropriate use and management of certain Internet of Things devices under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to review and revise its standards and guidelines at least once every 5 years to ensure that they are at least as comprehensive as the standards and guidelines adopted by the Director of NIST; etc.
Title
State Procurement – Internet of Things Devices – Guidelines, Standards, and Purchasing Restrictions
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Communications
Contracts
Cybersecurity
Disclosure
Equipment
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Attorney General
Communications
Contracts
Cybersecurity
Disclosure
Equipment
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |