MD SB733 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that a community solar energy generating system be located in the same electric service territory as a subscriber for the subscriber to receive monthly electric bill credits; requiring the Public Service Commission to require an electric company to file a revised tariff and protocol related to the application of bill credits by November 1, 2022; and requiring the Commission by January 31, 2023 to approve or amend and approve the required tariffs and protocols.
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Alterations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1261 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-22 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 306.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0733?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0733f.pdf |