MD SB730 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the conditions under which a motor vehicle dealer's failure to comply with a manufacturer's or distributor's specific requirements for processing a claim constitutes grounds for denial of a claim or reduction of the amount of compensation; prohibiting a motor vehicle manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from taking specified action against a dealer who provides to a customer information given to the dealer by a manufacturer related to any conditions affecting motor vehicle safety, durability, reliability, or performance; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {853625/1 Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {498172/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Claims
Disclosure
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Retail Sales
Safety
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Warranties
Disclosure
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Retail Sales
Safety
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Warranties