MD SB73 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a person who provides property management services to be registered as a property manager by the State Real Estate Commission before practicing in the State; prohibiting the providing of, attempting to provide, or offering to provide property management services unless registered with the Commission as a property manager; subjecting violators of this prohibition to a civil fine of not more than $1,000; requiring certain property managers to be covered by a certain surety bond; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22SenateHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-10-30SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB239 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback