MD SB729 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the manner in which the County Commissioners of Calvert County are elected beginning with the November 2014 general election; requiring that specified county commissioners be residents of and represent specified election districts; requiring that other county commissioners be residents of the county and represent the county at large; requiring that each candidate for the office of county commissioner specify when filing a certificate of candidacy specified information; etc.
Title
Calvert County - County Commissioners - Method of Election
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-45) (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Fisher) {123623/1 Rejected (43-93) (Y: 43 N: 93 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {423927/1 Rejected (49-88) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {833220/1 Rejected (38-89) (Y: 38 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Fisher) Rejected (37-84) (Y: 37 N: 84 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Fisher) {123623/1 Rejected (43-93) (Y: 43 N: 93 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {423927/1 Rejected (49-88) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {833220/1 Rejected (38-89) (Y: 38 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Fisher) Rejected (37-84) (Y: 37 N: 84 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-45) |
2013-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {123623/1 Rejected (43-93) |
2013-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {423927/1 Rejected (49-88) |
2013-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {833220/1 Rejected (38-89) |
2013-04-06 | House | Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (37-84) |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |