MD SB724 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-31 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-31 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to study closing or settlement protection practices of the title insurance industry and to make specified recommendations; requiring the Commissioner to consider specified matters in conducting the study; requiring the Commissioner to report findings and recommendations to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2012; etc.
Title
Title Insurance - Closing or Settlement Protection Practices - Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-31 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 567170/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-20 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Bonds
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Escrow Accounts
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Notices
Prices
Real Estate
Reports
Settlement Procedures
Theft
Titles
Bonds
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Escrow Accounts
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Notices
Prices
Real Estate
Reports
Settlement Procedures
Theft
Titles