MD SB721 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Small Business Reserve Program applies to certain universities in the State; requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to establish certain guidelines for the administration of the Small Business Reserve Program and to take certain actions to assist small businesses with procurement procedures and opportunities; requiring that a unit assess certain procurements with a total dollar value of $500,000 or less and either designate the procurement for the Program or request a waiver; etc.
Title
Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program - Administration and Application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {144431/1 Adopted |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB797 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Communications
Exemptions
Minorities
Procurement
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Women
Attorney General
Communications
Exemptions
Minorities
Procurement
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |