MD SB72 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB285
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to conduct a study of the participation of minority-owned businesses in the alcoholic beverages industry in the State; requiring the Office of the Attorney General and the Department of Transportation to provide staff for the study; and requiring the Office to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2023.
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry – Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-4) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB285 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
HB324 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
HB324 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Attorney General
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Counties
Discrimination
Human Relations
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minorities
Reports
Small Business
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Women
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Attorney General
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Counties
Discrimination
Human Relations
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minorities
Reports
Small Business
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Women