MD SB72 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time period within which an applicant for a surviving spouse license issued by the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors must submit verification of the death of the licensee and an application from 30 days to 10 days; requiring the Board to administer the law examination to an applicant for a surviving spouse license at least three times; etc.
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Surviving Spouse Licenses -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-01 | Hearing 2/3 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-20 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |