MD SB717 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a county board of education may authorize a county superintendent of schools, under certain circumstances, to provide virtual education days to students instead of closing the public schools in the county because of severe weather conditions; requiring the county board to publish the plan for use of virtual education days on the school system's website; requiring a county superintendent to adequately design the virtual education day model before implementation of the first virtual education day; etc.
Title
Public Schools – Virtual Education Days – Authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-2) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {573127/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Counties
County Administrators
Education
Education, Boards of
meetings
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
School Administration
Students
Weather
County Administrators
Education
Education, Boards of
meetings
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
School Administration
Students
Weather