MD SB717 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations on ways Western Maryland counties, Southern Maryland counties, Eastern Shore counties, and Frederick, Carroll, and Harford counties can work together to obtain federal assistance to improve specified communications services and accessibility in the specified counties; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by November 30, 2017; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621
2017-04-10SenateReturned Passed
2017-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2017-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2017-04-04HouseRereferred to Economic Matters
2017-03-27HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2017-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-03-24SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-24SenateFavorable with Amendments {997576/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-24SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2017-03-07SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0717?ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0717f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0717t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_621_sb0717t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0717_99757601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0717.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0717_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0717_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0717,s-0825&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0717,h-1337&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback