MD SB717 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt specified regulations for licensing and registration associated with radiation machines; requiring the Department to adopt regulations that establish a specified rate for the registration of radiation machines; repealing specified provisions of law related to radiation machines in dental offices or facilities; altering a specified exemption from specified fees applicable to specified dental schools; etc.
Title
Environment - Radiation Machines - Registration Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-8) (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-8) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464936/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464936/1 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Dentists
Environment
Environment, Department of
Equipment
Exemptions
Fees
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Licenses
Notices
Radiation
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Dentists
Environment
Environment, Department of
Equipment
Exemptions
Fees
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Licenses
Notices
Radiation
Registration
Rules and Regulations