MD SB717 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring hospitals, related institutions, alternative health systems, and employers to report specified employment actions and terminations of employment of athletic trainers and physician assistants to the State Board of Physicians, subject to specified exceptions; requiring athletic trainers and physician assistants to notify hospitals, related institutions, alternative health systems, or employers of a decision to enter an alcohol or a drug treatment program; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Clinics
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Privacy
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Substance Abuse
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Privacy
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Substance Abuse
Work, Labor and Employment