MD SB714 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 221
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 221
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to determine the salary of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore City; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to determine the pension of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore City; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 221 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB490 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 220
Subjects
Baltimore City
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Estates and Trusts
Judges
Orphans' Court
Public Officials
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses
Work, Labor and Employment
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Estates and Trusts
Judges
Orphans' Court
Public Officials
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 2 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |