MD SB714 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a certain provision of law may not be construed to authorize the possession of marijuana or cannabis on the grounds of a local correctional facility; authorizing the imposition of certain penalties for the possession of marijuana or cannabis on the grounds of a local correctional facility; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Possession of Medical Cannabis in Local Correctional Facilities – Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-5) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-27HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2018-03-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
2018-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (40-5)
2018-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-08SenateFloor Amendment {983028/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
2018-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Amendment {487872/1 Adopted
2018-03-07SenateSpecial Order until 3/8 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
2018-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {487872/1 Finance
2018-03-07SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Serafini) Adopted
2018-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {487872/1
2018-03-06SenateLaid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
2018-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {487872/1
2018-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-01SenateHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback