MD SB710 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that certain provisions of law may apply to contributions to the County Executive or the members of the County Council of Anne Arundel County or candidates for election to those offices; authorizing the County Council of Anne Arundel County to enact a local law to regulate the participation of a member of the County Council or the County Executive of Anne Arundel County in any legislative action relevant to a zoning change or amendment or to a certain application under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555
2019-04-03SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (139-1)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {754038/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback