MD SB710 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of members of the Baltimore City School Commissioners; requiring the three board members be elected at large by the voters of Baltimore City; altering the length of a term of the members of the board; requiring specified board members to be elected at a specified election and in accordance with specified provisions of law; providing for the staggering of the terms of specified members; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Partially Elected School Board
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appeals
Baltimore City
Circuit Courts
Discipline
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Elections
Hearings
Baltimore City
Circuit Courts
Discipline
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Elections
Hearings