MD SB71 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB759
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-16 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-16 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Correction to allow a certain pregnant woman and a certain woman who recently gave birth to transfer to the prerelease unit for women for up to 1 year following the birth; establishing the Healthy Start Bonding Program to facilitate strong bonds between incarcerated women and their children; and requiring the Division to allow liberal visitation between certain individuals and certain children under certain circumstances.
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-16 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-2) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB191 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-10 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
SB759 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
SB759 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Correction, Division of
Corrections
Health
Parents and Guardians
Pregnancy
Prerelease and Reentry
Visitation Rights
Women
Corrections
Health
Parents and Guardians
Pregnancy
Prerelease and Reentry
Visitation Rights
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 3 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 3 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 3 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |