MD SB708 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to apply to the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository for criminal history records checks for certain youth camp applicants; requiring that the Department issue a certain written determination to a youth camp within 3 business days; repealing the authority of youth development organizations and programs to request from the Department a determination of whether the results of a criminal history records check would prohibit the hiring of a job applicant; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Youth Camps, Development Organizations, and Programs - Criminal History Records Checks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 226
2023-04-10SenateReturned Passed
2023-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2023-04-08HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-04-07HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2023-03-22HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-03-20HouseReferred Judiciary
2023-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2023-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-03-16SenateFloor Amendment {183723/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted
2023-03-16SenateFavorable Adopted
2023-03-16SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
2023-03-16SenateFavorable
2023-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2023-02-14SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General14403.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General14407(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback