MD SB708 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that there is a Compliance Officer within the Office of the Inspector General in the Maryland Department of Health; authorizing the Inspector General to investigate behavior in the Department that threatens public safety or demonstrates negligence, incompetence, or malfeasance; and requiring the Inspector General, the Compliance Officer, or a designated Assistant Inspector General to respond within 30 business days to an individual who has filed a complaint or allegation.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Inspector General
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-28) |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {753127/1 Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {443428/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Emergencies
Ethics
Health
Health, Department of
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Negligence
Procurement
Public Health
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Emergencies
Ethics
Health
Health, Department of
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Negligence
Procurement
Public Health
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 2 | 502.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |