MD SB708 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the required uses for certain funds appropriated for Safe Streets Initiatives in Baltimore City; altering the maximum amount of a grant for a certain Safe Streets Initiative; requiring the Governor to annually include in the annual budget bill at least $3,000,000 in general funds to the Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund; authorizing the Fund to be used for oversight of the Fund, public outreach and education, and technical assistance and best practice education for grantees; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund and Advisory Council - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 126 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (104-28)
2020-03-18HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (126-4)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-03-17HouseReferred Appropriations Judiciary
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (42-4)
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {798176/1 Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB822 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety4901(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety4902(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety4903(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety4904(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety4905(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety4907(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback