MD SB708 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program and Fund; specifying the purposes of the Program and the Fund; requiring the Maryland Biotechnology Center in the Department of Business and Economic Development to administer the Fund; establishing criteria and award amounts for grants awarded under the Program; requiring recipients of Program funds to pay a royalty; requiring the Governor to make a specified appropriation beginning in fiscal year 2015; etc.
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-7) (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-7) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {207274/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Appropriations
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Diseases
Economic and Community Development
Fees
Grants
Health
Industry and Technology
Investments
Medical Research
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Smoking
Sunset
Tobacco
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Diseases
Economic and Community Development
Fees
Grants
Health
Industry and Technology
Investments
Medical Research
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Smoking
Sunset
Tobacco