MD SB707 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB484
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each carrier to inform members and beneficiaries of the procedure to request a referral to a specialist or nonphysician specialist who is not part of the carrier's provider panel; establishing a certain requirement on certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations related to the provision of certain mental health and substance use disorder services provided to a member by a nonparticipating provider; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Coverage for Nonparticipation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {233220/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB484 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
HB912 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
HB912 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Subjects
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 830 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |