MD SB707 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from transporting a certain rapid fire trigger activator into the State or manufacturing, possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a certain rapid fire trigger activator, subject to a certain exception; defining "rapid fire trigger activator" as any device, including a removable manual or power-driven activating device, constructed so that, when installed in or attached to a firearm the rate at which the trigger is activated increases or the rate of fire increases; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-29) (Y: 112 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {773023/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (42-91) (Y: 43 N: 92 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-11) (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {303023/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (17-28) (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {883329/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-29) (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {593129/2 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-28) (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {233624/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28) (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {643520/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-28) (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {883329/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (19-25) (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 252
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (111-29)
2018-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-07HouseFloor Amendment {773023/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (42-91)
2018-04-07HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-07HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2018-04-03HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (36-11)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFloor Amendment {593129/2 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-28)
2018-03-16SenateFloor Amendment {233624/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)
2018-03-16SenateFloor Amendment {883329/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-29)
2018-03-16SenateFloor Amendment {303023/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (17-28)
2018-03-16SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFloor Amendment {883329/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (19-25)
2018-03-16SenateFloor Amendment {643520/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-28)
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {498175/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-28SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0707&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0707f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0707t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_252_sb0707t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0707_49817501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0707_64352001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0707_88332901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0707_23362401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0707_30302301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0707_59312902.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0707_88332902.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0707_77302301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0707.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0707_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0586.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0587.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0592.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0593.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0594.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0595.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0679.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0707_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1291.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1387.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback