MD SB700 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Motion to refer to Budget and Taxation (Senator King) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Motion to refer to Budget and Taxation (Senator King) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the initial cap on participation in a certain waiver; requiring a certain waiver submitted by the Maryland Department of Health to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to include a request for a cap on waiver participation that is set at not less than a certain percentage of the projected annual demand for certain services; requiring the Department to screen individuals who are eligible to receive certain services as soon as possible after the Department receives certain notification; etc.
Title
Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law)
Sponsors
Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Motion to refer to Budget and Taxation (Senator King) Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Special Order until 3/21 (Senator King) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Assisted Living
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Data
Disabilities
Disabled
Health
Health, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Notices
Public Health
Public Information
Time
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Data
Disabilities
Disabled
Health
Health, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Notices
Public Health
Public Information
Time