MD SB700 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study, analyze, identify, evaluate, and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2018; and terminating the Act after May 31, 2019.
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge
Sponsors
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |